NM HB2 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 73(partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

General Appropriation Act Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Appropriation Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14House[LD 19] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 73(partial veto).
2018-02-14House[LD 19] s and then to rpt adptd
2018-02-14House[LD 10] h and then to rpt adptd
2018-02-12House[LD 18] Conference committee
2018-02-12House[LD 18] This procedure could follow if the Senate refuses to recede from its amendments
2018-02-13House[LD 8] House has failed to concur in Senate amendments on a House bill
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Passed Senate (40-2)
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2018-01-31Senate[LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance
2018-01-31Senate[LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance
2018-01-30House[LD 3] Passed House (65-3)
2018-01-30House[LD 3] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-30House[LD 3] Do not pass committee report adopted
2018-01-16House[LD 1] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
2018-01-16House[LD 1] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback