NM HB2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 135(partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 135(partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Appropriation Act Of 2017
Title
General Appropriation Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 135(partial veto). |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] h and then to cncrd |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Passed Senate (33-8) |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (37-32) |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |