NM HB192 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lodger's Tax For Tourism Services
Title
Lodger's Tax For Tourism Services
Sponsors
Rep. Candy Ezzell [R] | Rep. Bob Wooley [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 30 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (30-1) |
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Passed House (66-0) |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Ways & Means |
2016-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and then to House Ways & Means |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Printed |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |