NM HB190 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School District Employee Background Checks
Title
School District Employee Background Checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Passed House (57-0) |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] HLEDC |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] HLEDC and then to House Education |