NM HB19 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drinking Water System Financing
Title
Drinking Water System Financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 37 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (62-0) |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |