NM HB19 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (40-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.2) Ch.16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (40-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.2) Ch.16.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health care work force data collection
Title
Health care work force data collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (40-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.2) Ch.16. | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Passed House (59-0) | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do not pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Referred to House Health & Government Affairs | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Health & Government Affairs | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Printed | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Not Printed | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] House Pre-file |