NM HB182 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 51.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 51.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Move apprenticeship assistance program
Title
Move apprenticeship assistance program
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miera [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 51. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Education |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (59-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Labor & Human Resources and then to House Appropriations & Finance |