NM HB18 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (38-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 13 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - [LD 20] Passed Senate (38-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer health info data management
Title
Transfer health info data management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (38-0) | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Passed House (64-0) | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to House Health & Government Affairs | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Assigned to House Health & Government Affairs | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Printed | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Not Printed | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] House Pre-file |