NM HB177 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solo-worker & Out-of-state Revenue Program
Title
Solo-worker & Out-of-state Revenue Program
Sponsors
Rep. Don Tripp [R] | Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 57 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Business & Employment |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Business & Employment and then to House Appropriations & Finance |