NM HB174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] h and then to cncrd Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] h and then to cncrd Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Election Act
Title
Local Election Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] h and then to cncrd Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-02-18 | Senate | [LD 33] Passed Senate (28-10) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (38-29) |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] HLELC |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] HLELC and then to House Judiciary |