NM HB174 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] PASSED/S (25-11) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] PASSED/S (25-11) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure fairness act
Title
Foreclosure fairness act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Egolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/S (25-11) POCKET VETO. | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP-SJC | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] SPAC/SJC-SPAC | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DNP-CS/DP- PASSED/H (64-5) | |
2011-02-09 | [LD 23] DP-HJC | |
2011-01-21 | [LD 4] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC |