NM HB174 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Street gang participation & recruiting
Title
Street gang participation & recruiting
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] SJC API. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DNP-CS/DP - PASSED/H (61-4) | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] w/o rec-HJC | |
2010-01-22 | [LD 4] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC |