NM HB173 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Child & Family Databank Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child & Family Databank Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08SenateAction Postponed Indefinitely
2019-03-08SenateSent to SJC - Referrals: SJC
2019-03-06HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0
2019-03-05HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-18HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2019-02-04HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-17HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC/HAFC
2019-01-15HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback