NM HB17 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 121 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 121 - Apr. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Leases & Use Of Leased Water
Title
Water Leases & Use Of Leased Water
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 121 - Apr. 2 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-10 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:0 |
2019-03-08 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-28 | House | HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HJC |