NM HB167 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (29-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.169.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (29-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.169.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fire prevention ordinances & code changes
Title
Fire prevention ordinances & code changes
Sponsors
Rep. David Doyle [R] | Rep. David Doyle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (29-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.169. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SRC | |
2011-02-16 | [LD 30] SCORC/SRC-SCORC | |
2011-02-25 | [LD 39] PASSED/H (62-2) | |
2011-02-19 | [LD 33] DP | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP/a-HJC | |
2011-01-21 | [LD 4] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC |