NM HB166 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - [LD 21] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - [LD 21] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Home Inspector Licensing Act
Title
Home Inspector Licensing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | [LD 21] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-08 | Senate | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-2) |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-27 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2016-01-27 | House | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Business & Employment |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Business & Employment and then to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Printed |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |