NM HB162 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Option For Liquor Sales Hours
Title
Local Option For Liquor Sales Hours
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 9 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | [LD 25] Passed Senate (27-0) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Assigned to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (54-11) |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HLELC |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-19 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-19 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to HLELC |
2017-01-19 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue Assigned toerral withdrawn |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Taxation & Revenue |