NM HB159 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Multicultural Education Framework

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Multicultural Education Framework

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16SenateFailed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
2019-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2019-03-11SenateSEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-03-01SenateSent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC
2019-02-28HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0
2019-02-26HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-28HouseHEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-17HouseSent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC
2019-01-15HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback