NM HB153 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employee Suicide Identification Training
Title
Employee Suicide Identification Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC |
2019-03-03 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:13 |
2019-02-27 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to: HSEIC |
2019-02-04 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |