NM HB151 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - [LD 13] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - [LD 13] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional revision commission
Title
Constitutional revision commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Passed House (68-0) | |
2012-02-06 | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-19 | [LD 3] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-01-19 | [LD 3] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=151&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/house/HB0151.pdf |