NM HB15 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (33-0) SGND (Apr.1) Ch. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (33-0) SGND (Apr.1) Ch. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disposition of remains for military personnel
Title
Disposition of remains for military personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (33-0) SGND (Apr.1) Ch. 22. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SPAC/SJC-SPAC | |
2011-01-31 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (59-0) | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] DP | |
2011-01-26 | [LD 9] DP-HJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |