NM HB14 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - [LD 32] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - [LD 32] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Misleading extensions of credit
Title
Misleading extensions of credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-30 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Passed House (58-0) |
2013-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-01-15 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |