NM HB139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-08 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hotel Employee Panic Buttons
Title
Hotel Employee Panic Buttons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-08 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:41 N:22 |
2019-02-19 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-08 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HCEDC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |