NM HB138 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Voting For Some 17 Year-olds
Title
Voting For Some 17 Year-olds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 28 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (24-16) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (41-26) |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Printed |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |