NM HB134 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-22 - [LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-22 - [LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School Personnel Minimum Salaries
Title
School Personnel Minimum Salaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HLEDC |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HLEDC and then to House Education |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Legislation/Legislation?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=134&year=17 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/17%20Regular/bills/house/HB0134.pdf |