NM HB134 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Government Planning Fund
Title
Local Government Planning Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 43 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (66-0) |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |