NM HB133 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Disclosure of contributions by contractors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure of contributions by contractors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-16House[LD 55] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date.
2013-03-16Senate[LD 47] Passed Senate (41-0)
2013-03-16Senate[LD 47] Floor amendment adopted
2013-03-15Senate[LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-03-07Senate[LD 38] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2013-03-07Senate[LD 38] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2013-02-14Senate[LD 23] Referred to Senate Rules
2013-02-14Senate[LD 23] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary
2013-02-27House[LD 32] Passed House (64-0)
2013-02-27House[LD 32] Floor amendment adopted
2013-02-25House[LD 30] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2013-02-25House[LD 30] Do not pass committee report adopted
2013-02-06House[LD 17] Referred to House Judiciary
2013-02-06House[LD 17] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2013-02-06House[LD 17] Do not pass committee report adopted
2013-01-16House[LD 2] Referred to House Voters & Elections
2013-01-16House[LD 2] Assigned to House Voters & Elections and then to House Judiciary

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback