NM HB130 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Conference committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State procurement committee & reviews

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State procurement committee & reviews

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-31House[LD 51] Conference committee
2015-03-31House[LD 51] This procedure could follow if the Senate refuses to recede from its amendments
2015-03-24House[LD 46] House has failed to concur in Senate amendments on a House bill
2015-03-17Senate[LD 41] Passed Senate (37-0)
2015-03-16Senate[LD 40] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-03-02Senate[LD 30] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2015-02-27House[LD 29] Passed House (63-0)
2015-02-26House[LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-29House[LD 8] HBEC
2015-01-29House[LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-01-22House[LD 3] HGEIC
2015-01-22House[LD 3] HGEIC and then to HBEC
2015-01-20House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback