NM HB13 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School equalization guarantee "local revenue"
Title
School equalization guarantee "local revenue"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Education |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (40-26) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted and then to a |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Education |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Education and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |