NM HB12 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cannabis Regulation Act
Title
Cannabis Regulation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC |
2021-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:39 N:31 |
2021-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-02-24 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-16 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-02 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HTRC |