NM HB12 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 63.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 63.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Owner duties for recreational use of land
Title
Owner duties for recreational use of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (Apr. 5) Ch. 63. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SJC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] SCONC/SJC-SCONC | |
2011-02-10 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (64-0) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DNP-CS/DP | |
2011-01-28 | [LD 11] DP-HJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |