NM HB117 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 19 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 19 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lodgers' Tax Exemptions
Title
Lodgers' Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 19 - Mar. 4 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:2 |
2020-02-15 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:5 |
2020-02-07 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2020-01-30 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-23 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HTRC |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |