NM HB115 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wage fraud investigations & procedures
Title
Wage fraud investigations & procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (34-28) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Assigned to House Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Printed |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-27 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-27 | House | [LD 5] Not Printed |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |