NM HB113 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Magistrate Court Changes
Title
Magistrate Court Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:46 N:14 |
2023-02-13 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-01-26 | House | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-19 | House | Sent to HGEIC - Referrals: HGEIC/HJC |