NM HB102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 26 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 26 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Board Certification Scholarship Act
Title
National Board Certification Scholarship Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 26 - Mar. 4 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2020-02-15 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:1 |
2020-02-08 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-30 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to: HEC/HAFC |
2020-01-24 | House | Printed |
2020-01-22 | House | Not Printed |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |