NM HB101 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighter & Emergency Peer Support Act
Title
Firefighter & Emergency Peer Support Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2024-02-01 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:6 |
2024-01-30 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2024-01-29 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-01-17 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC/HAFC |
2024-01-16 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |