NM HB1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Feed Bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Feed Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23HouseSigned by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
2019-01-23HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 1 - Jan. 25
2019-01-23HouseHouse has concurred with Senate Amendments
2019-01-23SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0
2019-01-22SenateSent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC
2019-01-22SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-01-16SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2019-01-16HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0
2019-01-16HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-15HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback