NJ SR95 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AR183
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes U.S. Secretary of State to negotiate with Libya for repatriation of remains of Richard Somers.
Title
Memorializes U.S. Secretary of State to negotiate with Libya for repatriation of remains of Richard Somers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR173 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)
AR183 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
AR183 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)