NJ AR173 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AR183
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes U.S. Secretary of State to negotiate with Libya for repatriation of remains of Richard Somers.
Title
Memorializes U.S. Secretary of State to negotiate with Libya for repatriation of remains of Richard Somers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR183 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
SR95 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR95 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Filed with Secretary of State