NJ SR66 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President to establish Presidential Youth Council.
Title
Urges President to establish Presidential Youth Council.
Sponsors
Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR126 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/SR66 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/SR/66_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR66 |