NJ SR64 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges reauthorization of federalTerrorism Risk Insurance Program.
Title
Urges reauthorization of federalTerrorism Risk Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR104 (Same As) 2014-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SR64 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SR/64_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR64 |