NJ SR55 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges United States Air Force to base F-35 fighter jets at 177th Fighter Wing in Atlantic City.
Title
Urges United States Air Force to base F-35 fighter jets at 177th Fighter Wing in Atlantic City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR149 (Same As) 2016-10-20 - Filed with Secretary of State