NJ AR149 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on October 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on October 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges United States Air Force to base F-35 fighter jets at 177th Fighter Wing in Atlantic City.
Title
Urges United States Air Force to base F-35 fighter jets at 177th Fighter Wing in Atlantic City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-2) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR55 (Same As) 2016-08-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AR149 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AR/149_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR149 |