NJ SR144 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges US Congress to permanently extend federal tax credit for railroad track maintenance.
Title
Urges US Congress to permanently extend federal tax credit for railroad track maintenance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR258 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SR144 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SR/144_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR144 |