NJ SR129 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR87
Note: Carry Foward to future SR63
Note: Carry Foward to future SR63
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Resolution Passed Senate (Voice)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Resolution Passed Senate (Voice)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges EPA to expend funds from NJ Superfund settlements to remediate sites at issue.
Title
Urges EPA to expend funds from NJ Superfund settlements to remediate sites at issue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR129 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Resolution Passed Senate (Voice)
SR129 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Resolution Passed Senate (Voice)
AR197 (Same As) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
SR129 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Resolution Passed Senate (Voice)
AR197 (Same As) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee