NJ SJR96 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR127
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October of each year as "Disability Employment Awareness Month."
Title
Designates October of each year as "Disability Employment Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR53 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-31 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, JR-11. |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR53 |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
AJR53 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by SJR96
AJR127 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
AJR127 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee