NJ SJR77 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR236
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Substituted by AJR38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Substituted by AJR38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates April 16 of each year as "Upcycling Day" in State.
Title
Designates April 16 of each year as "Upcycling Day" in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Substituted by AJR38 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR38 (Same As) 2023-04-14 - Approved P.L.2023, JR-4.
AJR236 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
AJR236 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee