NJ SJR50 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR133
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR114
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR114
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-12-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-12-19 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November of each year as "Caregivers Awareness Month."
Title
Designates November of each year as "Caregivers Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-12-19 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR133 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR114 (Carry Over) 2022-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR114 (Carry Over) 2022-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee