NJ SJR49 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates third week in September of each year as "Go Gold for Kids with Cancer Awareness Week."
Title
Designates third week in September of each year as "Go Gold for Kids with Cancer Awareness Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Ajr106 Ac (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, JR-2. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-1-0) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR106 (1R) |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR106 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by SJR49 (1R)