NJ SJR40 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Approved P.L.2013, JR-8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Approved P.L.2013, JR-8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November of each year as "Children's Product Safety Awareness Month."
Title
Designates November of each year as "Children's Product Safety Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Ajr53 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Ajr53 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, JR-8. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR53 |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2012-08-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR53 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Substituted by SJR40